﻿ So, You Think You Can't Do Mental Arithmetic? - Articles Surfing
 | Home | Free Articles for Your Site | Submit an Article | Advertise | Link to Us | Search | Contact Us |

SEARCH ARTICLES
Custom Search

Article Surfing Archive

So, You Think You Can't Do Mental Arithmetic? - Articles Surfing

How many times have you heard someone say 'I can't do mental arithmetic'?

Perhaps it is something that you have said yourself many times . . . I know I have!

The problem, I have found, is not 'I can't do mental arithmetic' but 'I don't know how to do mental arithmetic'.

This certainly was the case for me.

Let me show you what i mean.

If I were to ask you to multiply 43 x 11. Would you be able to do it? How long would it take you to do it?

If you asked me that 1 year ago, I would have said 'I can do it but it will take me a while'. You see, like many people, I believed that I couldn't do mental arithmetic.

Now, let me show you how to do 43 x 11 in your head in less than 1 second (it will take you less than 1 second once you know how to do it).

1. separate the 4 and the 3 thus: 4 __ 3 (because we are going to put a number in between the 4 and the 3),

2. add 4 + 3 to get: 4 + 3 = 7,

3. place the 7 between the 4 and the 3 to get: 4 7 3,

That is your answer: 43 x 11 = 473

How easy is that?

Practice on the following and see how quickly you can do them in your mind:

- 23 x 11 = (23 x 11 = 253)

- 18 x 11 = (18 x 11 = 198)

- 71 x 11 = (71 x 11 = 781)

If I were to ask you now, what is 27 x 11? You would be able to work it out in your head in less than 1 second and tell me: 297.

Congratulations! You have gone from 'I can't do mental arithmetic' to 'Gee, that was easy!'.

The thing about mental arithmetic is: the problem is not 'I can't do mental arithmetic' but 'I don't know how to do mental arithmetic'.

There are many such tricks to doing mental arithmetic and once you know them, you will be amazed at the type of mental arithmetic calculations you will be able to do in you head in less than 1 second:

- divide by 5 eg. 42 / 5 = ?

- multiply by 5 eg. 68 x 5 = ?

- square a number that ends in 5 eg. 45 x 45 = ?

- and so on . . .

So, take heart! You are not as 'dumb' as you think. You can't do mental arithmetic simply because you were never shown how to do it . . . and not because you can't!

Serge M Botans

Submitted by:

Serge Botans

Serge M Botans is the CEO of the web site Mental Workoutand has taught Maths/Science for 14 years in a High School.

RELATED SITES

https://articlesurfing.org/education2/so_you_think_you_cant_do_mental_arithmetic.html

ARTICLE CATEGORIES

Aging
Arts and Crafts
Auto and Trucks
Automotive
Cancer Survival
Career
Classifieds
Computers and Internet
Computers and Technology
Cooking
Culture
Education
Education #2
Entertainment
Etiquette
Family
Finances
Food and Drink
Food and Drink B
Gardening
Health
Hobbies
Home Improvement
Home Management
Humor
Internet
Jobs
Kids and Teens
Learning Languages
Legal
Legal B
Marketing
Marketing B
Medicines and Remedies
Music and Movies
Opinions
Parenting
Parenting B
Pets
Pets and Animals
Poetry
Politics
Politics and Government
Real Estate
Recreation
Recreation and Sports
Science
Self Help
Self Improvement
Short Stories
Site Promotion
Society
Sports
Travel and Leisure
Travel Part B
Web Development
Wellness, Fitness and Diet
World Affairs
Writing
Writing B